EP1033229 - Stereolithographic method and apparatus with control to vary prescribed stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia California 91355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia, California 91355 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia California 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beers, D.Ross 2430 Los Amigos Street La Crescenta, California 91214 / US | 02 /
Partanen, P. Jouni 1146 Montecito Drive Los Angeles, California 90031 / US | 03 /
Tang Nansheng 25335 Via Artina Valencia California 91355 / US | [2004/10] |
Former [2000/36] | 01 /
Beers, D.Ross 2430 Los Amigos Street La Crecenta, California 91214 / US | ||
02 /
Partanen, P. Jouni 1146 Montecito Drive Los Angeles, California 90031 / US | |||
03 /
Tang Nansheng 25335 Via Artina Valencia California 91355 / US | Representative(s) | Bluff, John William, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Bluff, John William, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300964.4 | 08.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | US19990246502 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: US 246502 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033229 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033229 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033229 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B29C35/08 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
B29C64/40 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
B29K2105/243 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0073 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/26] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stereolithografische Verfahren und Vorrichtung mit Kontrolle zum Verändern der vorgeschriebenen Anregung | [2000/36] | English: | Stereolithographic method and apparatus with control to vary prescribed stimulation | [2000/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil de stéréolithographie avec dispositif de contrôle pour faire varier la stimulation prescrite | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10268367 ; | [XA]JPH10119136 ; | [X]JPH0999490 ; | [A]EP0416124 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9208200 (3D SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 125, line 16 - page 128, line 15 * [Y] 3-5,11; | [X]US5530221 (BENDA JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,11 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10268367 A 19981009 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 3-5,11 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10119136 A 19980512 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE &TECHNOL; DENKEN ENG KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-11 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09099490 A 19970415 (SONY CORP;MONOPOOLE KK) [X] 1 * abstract * |