EP1028061 - Collapsible container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERSOURCE PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT LTD 1 Harley Street London W1G 9QD / GB | [2005/24] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states CONSUMER AND INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT LTD 1 Harley Street London W1G 9QD / GB | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states CONSUMER AND INDUSTRIAL PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT LTD (C.I.P.D.) 45 Russell Square WC1B 4JP London / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Consumer and Industrial Product Development Limited Suite 216, 120 Wilton Road London SW1V 1JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carola, Andrea c/o Consumer and Industrial Product Development Ltd. Suite 216, 120 Wilton Road London SW1V 1JZ / GB | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/33] | 01 /
Carola, Andrea, c/o Cons. & Ind. Prod. Dev. Ltd. Suite 216, 120 Wilton Road London SW1V 1JZ / GB | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/04] |
Former [2000/33] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300994.1 | 09.02.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | GB19990002871 | 09.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902871 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028061 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1028061 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/22 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B65D7/32 (EP);
B65D1/225 (EP);
B65D11/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Zusammenlegbarer Behälter | [2000/33] | English: | Collapsible container | [2000/33] | French: | Conteneur pliable | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 05.04.2005 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 18.04.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 26.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2002 | 28.02.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | IT | 09.02.2008 | LU | 09.02.2008 | IE | 11.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.02.2008 | ||
IE | 11.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 11.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
IE | 11.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH316588 (COMPTOIR LINIER [FR]) [A] 9,12 * pages 1-2; figures 1-10 *; | [XA]FR2327150 (SZABO ISTVAN [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * pages 1-2; figures 1-9 * [A] 4,14; | [A]FR2527167 (BALLEREAU JEAN [FR]) [A] 11* pages 5-8; figures 1-8 *; | [A]FR2545061 (BALLEREAU JEAN [FR]) [A] 4,5 * page 5, lines 22-31; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]WO9505319 (CLARK ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1 * pages 10-19; figures 1-7 * [A] 1,14 | Examination | DE824179 | US4735331 | EP0443327 | DE19512823 | US5642830 |