EP1030268 - Method for reducing X-ray noise [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS SA 283, rue de la Minière 78533 Buc Cedex / FR | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutenko, Vladislav 72, rue Marcel Dassault 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
Lebihen, Thierry 45, rue d'Anjou 78000 Versailles / FR | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Pedder, James Cuthbert GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301211.9 | 16.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | FR19990002032 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902032 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030268 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G06T5/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2001/19] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Röntgenstrahlenrauschreduktion | [2000/34] | English: | Method for reducing X-ray noise | [2000/34] | French: | Méthode pour la réduction du bruit de rayons X | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - AUFRICHTIG R ET AL, "X-RAY FLUOROSCOPY SPATIO-TEMPORAL FILTERING WITH OBJECT DETECTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (19951201), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 733 - 746, XP000548591 [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 734, paragraph 2 * * page 736, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.476114 |