EP1030304 - Optical disk, method for manufacturing optical disk, and entertainment system featuring the optical disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kutaragi, Ken, Sony Computer Entertainment, Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
Miura, Kazuo, Sony Computer Entertainment, Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301223.4 | 16.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990042392 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4239299 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030304 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030304 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/40 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G11B23/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/27] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Platte, Herstellungsverfahren für optische Platte, und Unterhaltungssystem mit optischer Platte | [2000/34] | English: | Optical disk, method for manufacturing optical disk, and entertainment system featuring the optical disk | [2000/34] | French: | Disque optique, procédé de fabrication de disque optique, et système de divertissement comprenant le disque optique | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/51] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JPH11250522 ; | [A]US4903255 (SUGAYA SYOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,15,16 * column A; figure -; claims 1-18 *; | [A]DE4242992 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,15,16 * column 2, line 6 - line 59; figure -; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0608126 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,15,16 * column A; figure -; claims 1-5,16-20 *; | [A]GB2290526 (TAYLOR DAVID JOHN [GB]) [A] 1,15,16 * column A; figure -; claims 1-17 *; | [PXA]EP0953937 (SECURENCY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [PX] 1,2,12 * column A; figure -; claims 1,19-21 * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * [PA] 15,16 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11250522 A 19990917 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [PA] 1,15,16 * abstract * |