EP1030191 - Semi-automated segmentation method for 3-dimensional ultrasound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The John P. Robarts Research Institute 100 Perth Drive London Ontario N6A 5K8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states The John P. Robarts Research Institute 100 Perth Drive London, Ontario N6A 5K8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladak, Hanif M. 4 Park Avenue Brantford, Ontario N3S 5H1 / CA | 02 /
Gill, Jeremy D. 699 Talbot St., Apt.404 London, Ontario N6A 5L8 / CA | 03 /
Steinman, David A. 1035 Patricia Street London, Ontario N6A 3V3 / CA | 04 /
Fenster, Aaron 107 Ambleside Drive London, Ontario N6G 4N9 / CA | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301267.1 | 17.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | US19990253385 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 253385 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030191 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030191 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G01S7/52, A61B8/00, G06T17/00, G06T5/00 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B8/00 (KR);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52036 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | G01S15/89, G01S7/52, A61B8/00, G06T17/00 | Designated contracting states | [2004/02] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbautomatisiertes Verfahren für dreidimensionale Ultraschall- Bilderzeugung | [2000/34] | English: | Semi-automated segmentation method for 3-dimensional ultrasound | [2000/34] | French: | Méthode semi-automatique de segmentation pour l'imagerie ultrasonique en trois dimensions | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4307956 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [X]US5559901 (LOBREGT STEVEN [NL]) [X] 1-6,8-12,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, lines 21-52 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 5 * * column 8, line 45 - column 10, line 54 * * column 11, line 52 - column 13, line 14 *; | [X] - COHEN L D ET AL, "Deformable models for 3-D medical images using finite elements and balloons", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION. CHAMPAIGN, IL, JUNE 15 - 18, 1992, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920615), ISBN 0-8186-2855-3, pages 592 - 598, XP010029362 [X] 1-6,8-12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1992.223130 | [X] - T. MACINERNEY, D. TERZOPOULOS, "A dynamic finite element surface model for segmentation and tracking in multidimensional medical images with application to cardiac 4D image analysis", COMPUTERIZED MEDICAL IMAGING AND GRAPHICS, (199502), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 69 - 83, XP002230282 [X] 1,2,15 * abstract * * page 69, column L - page 70, column R * * page 71, column R, paragraph L - page 72, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 75, paragraph 1 - page 82, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0895-6111(94)00040-9 | [XD] - YANG CHEN ET AL, "SURFACE DESCRIPTION OF COMPLEX OBJECTS FROM MULTIPLE RANGE IMAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION. SEATTLE, JUNE 21 - 23, 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19940621), ISBN 0-8186-5827-4, pages 153 - 158, XP000515835 [XD] 1-4,6 * abstract * * page 153, column L, paragraph 1 - page 157, column L, paragraph 6 * | [XD] - T. MCINERNEY, D. TERZOPOULOS, "Deformable Models in Medical Analysis: A Survey", MEDICAL IMAGE ANALYSIS, (199606), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 91 - 108, XP002230283 [XD] 1,15 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1361-8415(96)80007-7 | [A] - Y.J. ZHANG, "A survey on evaluation methods for image segmentation", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (1996), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1335 - 1346, XP002230284 [A] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(95)00169-7 | [A] - FENSTER A ET AL, "3-D vascular ultrasound imaging", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1998. IMTC/98. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. IEEE ST. PAUL, MN, USA 18-21 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980518), ISBN 0-7803-4797-8, pages 559 - 561, XP010281597 [A] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1998.679853 |