EP1128628 - Method and apparatus for Internet web site authentication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tradesafely.com Limited Manchester House, 86 Princess Street Manchester M1 6NG / GB | [2002/07] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Tradesafely.com Limited 268 Leek Road Endon, Staffordshire ST9 9BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawkes, Michael ESQ. Manchester House, 85 Princess Street Manchester, M1 6NG / GB | [2001/37] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
Hawkes, Michael ESQ. 268 Leek Road Endon, Staffordshire ST9 9BQ / GB | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301409.9 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128628 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
H04L63/168 (EP);
G06F16/957 (EP);
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/6218 (EP);
G06Q30/06 (EP);
H04L63/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/35] | Extension states | AL | 28.02.2002 | LT | 28.02.2002 | LV | 28.02.2002 | MK | 28.02.2002 | RO | 28.02.2002 | SI | 28.02.2002 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifizierung von Internet Web-Sites | [2001/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for Internet web site authentication | [2001/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'authentification des sites du web d'Internet | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 24.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0936531 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,23,28-31,38 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] *[A] 3-22,24-27,32-37; | [Y]US5968119 (STEDMAN STEVEN MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 3,32 * column 18, line 38 - column 19, line 64 *; | [XAY]US6018801 (PALAGE MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,23-25,28-31,34-36,38 * column 1, line 6 - line 13 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 22 - line 33 * * column 5, line 25 - line 35 * * column 6, line 14 - line 65 * * column 7, line 30 - line 42 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 10 * [A] 4-6,11-22,26,27,33 [Y] 3,32,37; | [YA]US6018724 (ARENT MICHAEL A [US]) [Y] 37 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 12 - line 35 * [A] 1-36,38 |