EP1037464 - A digital broadcast receiving apparatus and a digital broadcast transmitting apparatus with reduced power consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Masaaki Terakataryo 511, 2-2-2, Minamiterakatakitadori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-0046 / JP | 02 /
Osaka, Masataka 6-5-108, Myoukenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka-fu 576-0021 / JP | 03 /
Kitamura, Tomohiko 2-90, Okayamate-cho Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu 573-0034 / JP | 04 /
Kanzaki, Hideyuki Guranveruhibarigaoka 105, 3-2-1, Hibarigaoka Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken 655-0805 / JP | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301510.4 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | JP19990068142 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6814299 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1037464 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1037464 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP);
H04N21/2347 (EP);
H04N21/23614 (EP);
H04N21/26606 (EP);
H04N21/4181 (EP);
H04N21/426 (EP);
H04N21/4348 (EP);
H04N21/4405 (EP);
H04N21/443 (EP);
H04N21/4436 (EP);
H04N21/4623 (EP);
H04N7/163 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2003/15] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Digitales Rundfunk-Empfangsgerät und digitales Rundfunk-Sendegerät mit reduziertem Leistungsverbrauch | [2000/38] | English: | A digital broadcast receiving apparatus and a digital broadcast transmitting apparatus with reduced power consumption | [2000/38] | French: | Dispositif de réception d'une diffusion numérique et dispositif de transmission d'une diffusion numérique avec consommation d'énergie réduite | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 15.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10327389 ; | [A]JPH07226897 ; | [A]JPH1168881 ; | [A]JPH06164780 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10327389 A 19981208 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07226897 A 19950822 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11068881 A 19990309 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940912), vol. 018, no. 488, Database accession no. (E - 1605), & JP06164780 A 19940610 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-29 * abstract * |