EP1107209 - Remote control of appliance using a portable digital device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amro, Hatim Yousef, IBM United Kingdom Ltd. I.P.L Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB | 02 /
Dodson, John Paul, IBM United Kingdom Ltd. I.P.L Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB | 03 /
Kraft, George, IBM United Kingdom Ltd. I.P.L Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB | 04 /
Taylor, Kurt Russel, United Kingdom Ltd. I.P.L Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire S021 2JN / GB | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301542.7 | 28.02.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | US19990282629 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: US 282629 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1107209 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/28 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | Fernsteuerung einer Vorrichtung unter Verwendung eines tragbaren digitalen Gerätes | [2001/24] | English: | Remote control of appliance using a portable digital device | [2001/24] | French: | Télécommande d'un appareil avec un appareil portable numérique | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US5949351 (HAHM JIN-HO [KR]) [PX] 1,2,4-10 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 34 - column 8, line 27 *; | [X]KR0164089B (KETRI [KR]); | [XA]EP0626635 (FIRSTPERSON INC [US]) [X] 1,4-10 * column 9, line 18 - column 12, line 41 * * column 16, line 28 - line 57 * * column 33, line 39 - column 37, line 35 * * column 40, line 9 - column 41, line 32 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]EP0780990 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,10 * column 5, line 49 - column 11, line 46 * [A] 2-5,9 |