EP1035751 - Adaptive routing system and method for Qos packet networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aukia, Petri Pikkumaent 12 04600 Mantsala / FI | 02 /
Lakshman, T.V. 118 Victoria Drive Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US | 03 /
Mitra, Debasis 133 Summit Avenue, Apt. 43 Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 04 /
Kajamalai, G. Ramakrishnan 146 Maple Avenue Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | 05 /
Stiliadis, Dimitrios 2 Brentwood Terrace Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | [2000/42] |
Former [2000/37] | 01 /
Aukia, Petri 71 Country Club Road, Apt. 175 Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US | ||
02 /
Lakshman, T.V. 118 Victoria Drive Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US | |||
03 /
Mitra, Debasis 133 Summit Avenue, Apt. 43 Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | |||
04 /
Kajamalai, G. Ramakrishnan 146 Maple Avenue Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | |||
05 /
Stiliadis, Dimitrios 2 Brentwood Terrace Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301552.6 | 28.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | US19990266622 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 266622 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035751 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1035751 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/302 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES LEITWEGLENKUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR QOS-PAKETNETZE | [2000/37] | English: | Adaptive routing system and method for Qos packet networks | [2000/37] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE ADAPTATIFS D'ACHEMINEMENT POUR RESEAUX DE PAQUETS A QUALITE DE SERVICE GARANTIE | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/39] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0773698 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 2,9 * page 2, line 29 - line 51 * * page 3, line 11 - line 24 * * page 4, line 43 - line 49; figure 1 * * page 4, line 3 - line 14; figure 1 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17 * * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 44; figure 2 * * page 8, line 32 - line 44; figure 2 * * page 16, line 4 - line 34 * * page 17, line 19 - page 18, line 20; figure 4 * [A] 5,12; | [XY] - "Private Network-Network Interface Specification Version 1.0 (PNNI 1.0), af-pnni-0055.000", ATM FORUM TECHNICAL COMMITTEE, XX, XX, (199603), pages 1 - 190, XP002247350 [X] 3 * page 13, line 1 - line 11 * * page 15, paragraph 3.2.3 * * page 16, paragraph 3.2.3.2 * * page 36, line 16, paragraph 3.7 - line 43 * * page 56, paragraph 5.5.4.1.5 - paragraph 5.5.4.1.6 * [Y] 1,2,4,9,11,12 | [Y] - MIEI T ET AL, "Parallelization of IP-packet filter rules", INT. CONF. ON ALGORITHMS & ARCHITECTURES FOR PARALLEL PROCESSING, XX, XX, (1997), pages 381 - 388, XP002150561 [Y] 1,11,12 * page 381, line 1, paragraph 1 - line 11 * * page 382, line 1, paragraph 2 - page 383, line 15, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICAPP.1997.651506 | [YA] - GUERIN R A ET AL, "QoS routing mechanisms and OSPF extensions", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1997. GLOBECOM '97., IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 3-8 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4198-8, pages 1903 - 1908, XP010254897 [Y] 4 * page 1903, column 1, line 1, paragraph I - line 12 * * page 1906, column 2, line 1, paragraph III - page 1907, column 1, line 3 * [A] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1997.644603 | [A] - LAKSHMAN T V ET AL, "HIGH-SPEED POLICY-BASED PACKET FORWARDING USING EFFICIENT MULTI-DIMENSIONAL RANGE MATCHING", COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (199810), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 203 - 214, XP000914436 [A] 1,11 * page 203, column 2, line 20 - line 35 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/285243.285283 | [DA] - MITRA D ET AL, "ATM NETWORK DESIGN AND OPTIMIZATION: A MULTIRATE LOSS NETWORK FRAMEWORK", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19960801), vol. 4, no. 4, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 531 - 543, XP000620166 [DA] 1,9,11,12 * page 531 - page 540 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.532863 |