EP1035216 - Method of and apparatus for the detection of analytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azur Environmental Ltd. 540-545 Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle Wokingham Berkshire RG41 5TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states Azur Environmental Ltd. 540-545 Eskdale Road, Winnersh Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 5TU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
sang, Edman Dr, Dept. of Chemistry The University of Reading, White knights, Reading RG6 6AD / GB | 02 /
Amini, Fahim Dr Azur Environmental Ltd, Winnersh Triangle Wolkingham, Berkashire, RG41 5TU / GB | 03 /
Davis, Alison Ms Azur Environmental Ltd, 540-545 Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle, Wokingham, Berkshire / GB | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301777.9 | 03.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | GB19990005148 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9905148 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035216 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N27/02 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/68 (EP);
G01N27/3275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Methode und Apparat zum Nachweis von Analyten | [2000/37] | English: | Method of and apparatus for the detection of analytes | [2000/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection d'analytes | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2002 | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4376026 (HOFFMAN ALAN R, et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12,13 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5585646 (KOSSOVSKY NIR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12,13,15 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 11; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [XD] - TSANG S C ET AL, "Rare earth oxide sensors for ethanol analysis", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL, (1998), vol. 52, pages 226 - 235, XP002901031 [XD] 5-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(98)00233-0 | [A] - KASAMA K ET AL, "Highly sensitive MOSFET gas sensors with porous Pt-SnOx gate electrode for CO gas sensing applications", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19981012), vol. 129, no. 15, Database accession no. 192721n, page 968, column 2, XP002901032 [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12,13 * abstract * | [ ] - ELECTRON. LETT., (1998), vol. 34, no. 14, pages 1393 - 1395 | Examination | US4919770 | EP0244326 | WO9820162 |