Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |
01.11.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.04.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
22.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
23.08.2001 | Change - extension states | |
27.04.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
06.04.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
11.08.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |