EP1039275 - Retail terminal having a product scale which has an overlay member secured thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NRC International Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states NRC International Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Joanne Synowsky 60 Dover Cliff Way Alpharetta, Georgia 30022 / US | 02 /
Morrison, James 6055 Masters Club Drive Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | 03 /
Lin, Horng-Jaan 1046 Eagle's Ridge Court Lawrenceville, Georgia 30043 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2000/39] | Williamson, Brian, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301830.6 | 06.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990274409 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: US 274409 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039275 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/414, G09F23/00, G07G1/00, A47F9/04, G01G21/22 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
A47F9/048 (EP);
G01G19/4144 (EP);
G01G21/22 (EP);
G07G1/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verkaufsgerät mit einer Artikelwaage das mit einem Abdeckungsansatz versehen ist | [2000/39] | English: | Retail terminal having a product scale which has an overlay member secured thereto | [2000/39] | French: | Terminal de vente avec une balance pour produits comprendant un appendice de recouvrement | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5195599 (SALINI ROBERT J [US]) [X] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 62 - line 68 * * column 4, line 62 - line 65 * * column 5, line 6 - line 15 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 4 * [A] 3,6-10 [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US5834708 (SVETAL MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column A *; | [A]DE3442520 (BERKEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 2 * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 13 *; | [A]US4373133 (CLYNE NICHOLAS [GB], et al) [A] 3 * column 6, line 60 - line 63 *; | [A]EP0491348 (MANNERJOKI MIKA [FI], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 50 - line 55 * * column 4, line 17 - line 20 * |