EP1046516 - Variable contour grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.T.X. International, Inc. One Albion Road, Suite 200 Lincoln Rhode Island 02865 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states A.T.X. International, Inc. One Albion Road, Suite 200 Lincoln, Rhode Island 02865 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mittersinker, Gregor 134 Spring Green Road Warwick, Rhode Island 02888 / US | 02 /
Santos, Donald 29 Simmons Street Rehoboth, Massachusetts 02769 / US | 03 /
Seamans, Mitchell E. 3424 Diamond Hill Road Cumberland, Rhode Island 02864 / US | 04 /
Graves, Ralph 1 Catalpa Way Coventry, Rhode Island 02816 / US | 05 /
D'Amico, Richard 46 Canochet Trail Cranston, Rhode Island 02921 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301845.4 | 07.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | US19990296730 | 22.04.1999 Original published format: US 296730 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046516 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046516 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B43K23/004, B43K24/02 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B43K23/004 (EP,US);
B43K23/008 (KR);
B43K24/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Variabler Hüllengriff | [2000/43] | English: | Variable contour grip | [2000/43] | French: | Manchon de poignée variable | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2004 | BE | 09.06.2004 | CH | 09.06.2004 | FI | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | LI | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | CY | 07.03.2005 | LU | 07.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
IT | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
CY | 07.03.2005 | ||
LU | 07.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
CY | 07.03.2005 | ||
LU | 07.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
CY | 07.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2576751 (DORTMUND PAUL H) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3214706 (ORTH HANS) [A] 2,3* abstract *; | [A]US4475834 (BEAN DONALD F [ES]) [A] 2,3 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0353379 (ANCOS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [X]US5263275 (RUMBAUGH JAMES T [US]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * column W *; | [X]DE4405684 (DOZSA FARKAS ANDRAS [DE]) [X] 1,4,6 * page 5, line 65 - page 8, line 12; figure - * | by applicant | US1598873 | US1868441 | US4035089 | US4595307 | US5143463 | US5725323 |