EP1037416 - Optical fibre communication system comprising means for optical pulse reshaping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggleton, Benjamin John 17 Aubrey Street Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 02 /
Lenz, Gadi 69 Shady Lane Fanwood, New Jersey 07023 / US | 03 /
Slusher, Richard Elliott 79 Guinea Hollow Road Lebanon, New Jersey 08833 / US | 04 /
Spalter, Stefan Heinz 1308 Sunny Slope Road Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301863.7 | 07.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | US19990268285 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: US 268285 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1037416 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1037416 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037416 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
H04B10/25077 (EP,US);
H04B2210/258 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/33] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Faseroptisches Übertragungssystem mit Mitteln zur Regenerierung von Pulsen | [2000/38] | English: | Optical fibre communication system comprising means for optical pulse reshaping | [2000/38] | French: | Système de communication à fibres optiques comprenant des moyens pour la remise en forme des impulsions optiques | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.11.2002 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - EGGLETON B J ET AL, "DISTRIBUTED FEEDBACK PULSE GENERATOR BASED ON NONLINEAR FIBRE GRATING", ELECTRONICS LETTERS,GB,IEE STEVENAGE, (19961205), vol. 32, no. 25, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 2341 - 2342, XP000685330 [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19961581 | [A] - EGGLETON B J ET AL, "COMPRESSION OF OPTICAL PULSES SPECTRALLY BROADENED BY SELF-PHASE MODULATION WITH A FIBER BRAGG GRATING IN TRANSMISSION", APPLIED OPTICS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, (19981020), vol. 37, no. 30, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 7055 - 7061, XP000787129 [A] 1-12 * figures 2-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.37.007055 | [A] - LAZARIDIS P ET AL, "TIME-BANDWIDTH PRODUCT OF CHIRPED SECH2 PULSES: APPLICATION TO PHASE-AMPLITUDE-COUPLING FACTOR MEASUREMENT", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19950515), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1160 - 1162, XP000861747 [A] 1-12 * figures 1-4 * | [A] - P. LAZARIDIS, P. GALLION, G. DEBARGE, "Low effective phase-amplitude coupling factor for DFB and DBR lasers using complex coupling", CLEO CONFERENCE, Baltimore, USA, (19950522), page 192, XP002148736 [A] 1-12 * figures 2,3 * |