EP1035180 - Ink jet recording method and ink composition for use in said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Hidehiko, c/o Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-Chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hiroto, c/o Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-Chome, Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301965.0 | 10.03.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | JP19990067159 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6715999 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035180 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035180 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren und Tintenzusammensetzung, die in diesem Verfahren verwendet wird | [2000/37] | English: | Ink jet recording method and ink composition for use in said method | [2000/37] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et composition d'encre utilisée par ledit procédé | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 18.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2004 | BE | 21.07.2004 | CH | 21.07.2004 | FI | 21.07.2004 | LI | 21.07.2004 | NL | 21.07.2004 | DK | 21.10.2004 | GR | 21.10.2004 | SE | 21.10.2004 | ES | 01.11.2004 | PT | 21.12.2004 | CY | 10.03.2005 | IE | 10.03.2005 | LU | 10.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2005 | ||
IE | 10.03.2005 | ||
LU | 10.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2005 | ||
IE | 10.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
NL | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
BE | 21.07.2004 | ||
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
ES | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.10.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
CH | 21.07.2004 | ||
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
LI | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 21.07.2004 | |
FI | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 21.07.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 21.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0583096 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 46-50 *; | [A]EP0767225 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) |