EP1039645 - Method and apparatus for data compression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bentley, Jon Louis 449 Central Avenue, Apt. 2 New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
McIlroy, Malcolm Douglas 1 Hayfield Road Etna, New Hampshire 03750 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302040.1 | 14.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990273840 | 22.03.1999 Original published format: US 273840 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039645 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039645 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M7/30 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
G06T9/005 (EP,US);
H03M7/3084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/24] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenkompression | [2000/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for data compression | [2000/39] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de compression de données | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2311635 (MEMORY CORP PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 5 - line 8 * | [PX] - BENTLEY ET AL., "Data Compression using Long Common Strings", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, DCC '99, (19990329), pages 287 - 295, XP002142027 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document * | [DA] - KARP R M ET AL, "EFFICIENT RANDOMIZED PATTERN-MATCHING ALGORITHMS", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT,US,IBM CORPORATION, ARMONK, (19870301), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8646, pages 249 - 260, XP000022500 [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - WANG J T -L ET AL, "FAST RETRIEVAL OF ELECTRONIC MESSAGES THAT CONTAIN MISTYPED WORDS OR SPELLING ERRORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS. PART B: CYBERNETICS,US,IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (19970601), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 1083-4419, pages 441 - 451, XP000692641 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3477.584951 |