EP1039502 - Heat protection of sealing o-rings in a microwave plasma generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Tsutomu 3301 Monroe Street, No.5 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 02 /
Nowak, Thomas 880 E. Fremont Av.222 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 03 /
Nguyen, Chau 1748 Morill Ave. San Jose, California 95132 / US | 04 /
Ponnekanti, Hari 3407 Fitzsimmons Common Fremont, California 94538 / US | 05 /
Fairbairn, Kevin 106 Kennedy Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [2008/17] |
Former [2000/39] | 01 /
Tanaka, Tsutomu 3301 Monroe Street, No.5 Santa Clara, California 94087 / US | ||
02 /
Nowak, Thomas 880 E. Fremont Av.222 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | |||
03 /
Nguyen, Chau 1748 Morill Ave. San Jose, California 95132 / US | |||
04 /
Ponnekanti, Hari 3407 Fitzsimmons Common Fremont, California 95032 / US | |||
05 /
Fairbairn, Kevin 106 Kennedy Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302146.6 | 16.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990272898 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 272898 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039502 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039502 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1039502 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H01J37/32458 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32192 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2237/166 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/08] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeschutzvorrichtung für Dichtungsringe in einem Plasmaerzeugungsgerät | [2000/39] | English: | Heat protection of sealing o-rings in a microwave plasma generating apparatus | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif de protection thermique pour joints d'étanchéité dans un appareil générateur de plasma | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5082517 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US]) [A] 1,8,13,16,19 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 14 *; | [A]US5423942 (ROBBINS ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1,8,13,16,19 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 3 - line 28 * * column 4, line 3 - line 25 *; | [A]EP0680071 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,13,16,19 * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 16 ** figure 3 * |