EP1046363 - Holder for sheet-form articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benchmark Fabrications Limited Unit 2 Birds Hill Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 1PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Benchmark Fabrications Limited Unit 2 Birds Hill Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 1PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Andrew 49 Southmead Crescent Cheshunt, Hertfordshire EN8 8UU / GB | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302238.1 | 20.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | GB19990008892 | 20.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9908892 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046363 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046363 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47F7/14, A47F5/10, A47B97/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
A47B63/00 (EP,US);
A47B45/00 (EP,US);
A47F5/10 (EP,US);
A47F7/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Halter für blattförmige Gegenstände | [2000/43] | English: | Holder for sheet-form articles | [2000/43] | French: | Support d'articles en forme de feuilles | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 12.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2002 | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4938365 (CONWAY GERALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7; | [X]FR2661083 (DROUBAIX JEAN MARIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,7; | [X]GB2234428 (MARLER HALEY EXPOSYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,7; | [AD]GB607413 (SAMSON COHEN) [AD] 1,2,5,7; | [AD]GB870941 (ANDREW HOLDEN CORCORAN, et al) [AD] 1,2,5,7; | [AD]GB2126886 (CHAPMAN PHYLIP EDWARD) [AD] 1,2,5,7 |