EP1039686 - Capturing quality of service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bullard, William Carter Carroll 300 E 56th Street, No. 17A New York, NY 10022 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/39] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302406.4 | 24.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | US19990276207 | 25.03.1999 Original published format: US 276207 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039686 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039686 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04L12/26 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1485 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/28] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Erfassung von Dienstqualität | [2000/39] | English: | Capturing quality of service | [2000/39] | French: | Capture de qualité de service | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9607281 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 1 - line 22 * * page 12, line 20 - line 30 * * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 8 * * page 16, line 17 - line 32 ** figure 3 *; | [XY]WO9824208 (INMEDIA INVESTMENT LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 21, line 25 - line 30 * * page 32, line 1 - line 5 * * page 37, line 10 - line 12 * * page 38, line 36 - page 39, line 5 * * page 39, line 30 - page 40, line 15 * * page 45, line 34 - page 46, line 11 * * page 47, line 8 - line 21 * * page 48, line 9 - line 36 * * page 49, line 1 - line 17 * * page 50, line 17 - line 27 * * page 56, line 29 - line 33 * [Y] 5,8-11; | [YA]EP0849912 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 5,8-11 * page 2, column 2, line 37 - line 58 * * page 6, column 9, line 9 - line 25 * * page 6, column 10, line 47 - page 7, column 11, line 20 * * page 8, column 14, line 32 - page 9, column 15, line 17 * * figure 4 * [A] 1-4,6,7 |