EP1041762 - Communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2010/19] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states M(DGP1) LTD New Century Park PO Box 53 Coventry CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Marconi UK Intellectual Property Ltd New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS LIMITED New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodfellow, Robert Charles 4 Hawthorn Drive Brackley, Northants. NN13 6PA / GB | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz, et al Ericsson Limited Patent Unit UK Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz, et al Ericsson Limited Intellectual Property Group Maplewood Chineham Business Park Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8YB / GB | ||
Former [2005/23] | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz Marconi Intellectual Property New Century Park Post Point 51 Coventry, West Midlands CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | Hoste, Colin Francis Marconi Intellectual Property Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302490.8 | 27.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | GB19990007577 | 01.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9907577 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041762 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041762 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
H04J14/0209 (EP,US);
H04J14/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem | [2000/40] | English: | Communication system | [2000/40] | French: | Système de communication | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0794629 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 2, line 8 - line 28 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 16; figure 2 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 15; figure 3 *; | [XA]EP0814629 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9,10,14,15 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 1, line 40 - line 54 * * column 5, line 51 - column 8, line 16; figure 4 * * column 9, line 54 - column 11, line 16; figures 7-10 * [A] 2,3,7,8,11,12; | [XA]GB2315380 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,9,14,15 * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 4 * * page 7, line 2 - page 7, line 20; figure 1 * * page 12, line 19 - page 16, line 3; figure 3 * * page 20, line 18 - page 21, line 17; figure 7 * [A] 2,3,7,8,10-13; | [XA]US5748349 (MIZRAHI VICTOR [US]) [X] 1-6,8-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 21 - line 62 * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 60; figures 3,4 * * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 47; figure 4 * [A] 7; | [XA]US5841918 (LI JINGHUI [CA]) [X] 1,4,5,10-15 * column 3, line 14 - line 25; figure 1 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 67; figures 3-6 *[A] 2,3,6-9 |