EP1041292 - Retention of a gland within an actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Ltd c/o Ernst & Young, 400 Capability Green Luton Bedfordshire LU1 3LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Ltd c/o Ernst & Young, 400 Capability Green Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 3LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited Stratford Road, Solihull West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Lucas Industries Limited 46 Park Street London W1Y 4DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handley, Kevin James 9 Hallfarm Road Brewood, Stafford, ST19 9EZ / GB | 02 /
Harvey, John Herbert 1 Rockingham Drive Perton, Wolverhampton, WV6 7SJ / GB | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Hopley, Joanne Selina Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Pople, Joanne Selina Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2000/40] | Marsh, David John Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham, B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302495.7 | 27.03.2000 | [2000/40] | Priority number, date | GB19990007328 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9907328 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1041292 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1041292 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
F15B15/1438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [2000/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigung eines Zylinderkopfes in einem Zylinder | [2000/40] | English: | Retention of a gland within an actuator | [2000/40] | French: | Fixation d'une tête de cylindre dans un vérin | [2000/40] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3474710 (STRYKER SEYMOUR F) [X] 1,2,5,6,8 * column 4, line 45 - line 54; figures 2,3 * [Y] 7; | [Y]DE2158720 (INDRAMAT GMBH) [Y] 7 * page 3, line 16 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US4496071 (STEWART DUNCAN R [GB]); | [X]EP0348687 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * column 3, line 21 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3831909 (SRT STEUERUNGS REGELUNGSTECH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 3, line 1 - line 10; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0662568 (INVEST TECH AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8 * column 6, line 3 - line 15; figure 2 *; | [X]DE29814578U (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * figure 3; claim 1 * |