EP1044952 - High transverse dipole moment aryl compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN & NORTHERN IRELAND Defence Research Agency Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN & NORTHERN IRELAND Defence Research Agency Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, John Clifford The Old Granary Leigh Sinton, Worcestershire WR13 5ED / GB | 02 /
Sage, Ian Charles 47 Geraldine Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3NT / GB | 03 /
Goodby, John William Briar Garth, Dunswell Road Cottingham, East Yorkshire HU16 4JE / GB | 04 /
Hird, Michael 88 Highfields South Cave, East Yorkshire HU15 2AJ / GB | 05 /
Lewis, Robert Andrew 16 Kirkham Drive Hull, East Yorkshire HU5 2BT / GB | 06 /
Toyne, Kenneth Johnson 25 Hall Road Hull, East Yorkshire HU6 8QW / GB | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302786.9 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | GB19990008361 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9908361 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1044952 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1044952 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/225, C07C25/18, C09K19/12 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C09K19/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/093 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/263 (EP,US);
C07C25/18 (EP,US);
C07C45/292 (EP,US);
C07C45/455 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C09K2019/0444 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C25/13 (EP,US);
C07C17/263, C07C25/18 (US,EP);
C07C45/292, C07C49/233 (US,EP);
C07C45/455, C07C49/233 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/01] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Arylverbindungen mit hohem transversalen Dipolmoment | [2000/42] | English: | High transverse dipole moment aryl compounds | [2000/42] | French: | Composés aryles avec moment dipolaire transversal élevé | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 05.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4416272 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 28, line 48 - page 34, line 60 * * claims 1,7-10 *; | [X]DE4434976 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 19, line 27 - line 50 * * claims 1-3,6-9 *; | [A]WO9813324 (CHISSO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 40, line 24 - page 41, line 18 * * page 45, line 24 - page 46, line 27 * * page 49, line 19 - line 30 * * page 51, line 2 - page 52, line 18 * * page 52, line 27 - page 53, line 13 ** page 57, line 11 *; | [PX] - GOODBY, JOHN W. ET AL, "The synthesis and properties of host materials with fluoro substituents in the core and in a terminal chain for high dielectric biaxiality FLC mixtures", FERROELECTRICS (2000), 243(1-4), 19-26, XP000980288 [PX] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00150190008008003 |