EP1045348 - Financial document processing system and method of operating a financial document processing system during exception recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cosentino, Joseph 51 Republic Avenue Hamilton, Ontario L9B 2G7 / CA | 02 /
Anderson, Richard A. 7-225 Benjamin Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 1Z3 / CA | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Williamson, Brian, et al Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2000/42] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302934.5 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | US19990292892 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: US 292892 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1045348 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1045348 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G07D11/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2003/16] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wertpapierverarbeitungssystem und Verfahren zum Betreiben dessen nach einem Systemabsturz | [2000/42] | English: | Financial document processing system and method of operating a financial document processing system during exception recovery | [2000/42] | French: | Systeme pour traiter des papiers valeurs et méthode d'operation de celui-ci après une panne du systeme | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/45] | 25.09.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2007 | 25.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Request for further processing for: | 30.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5825506 (BEDNAR GREGORY M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 35 - line 65; figure 3 *; | [A]US4315246 (MILFORD RICHARD E) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 8 - line 27 * * column 5, line 35 - column 8, line 14 * | [X] - "CODELINE DATA MATCHING OF REJECTS ON A READER SORTER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, page 503, XP000456505 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - "HOST CODELINE DATA MATCH", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940801), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 657 - 658, XP000456560 [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0005] * |