EP1050943 - Electronic motor protection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensata Technologies, Inc. 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | [2007/10] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denvir, Kerry J. 110 Brook Haven Drive, Apt. No. 7A Attleboro, Massachusetts 02703 / US | 02 /
Nield, Joseph G., Jr. 3 Dorene Drive North Smithfield, Rhode Island 02896 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/45] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al ABEL & IMRAY, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302975.8 | 07.04.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | US19990289509 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: US 289509 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050943 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050943 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/06, H02H7/085, H01H1/06 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H02H1/06 (EP,US);
F16K5/0657 (KR);
F16K27/067 (KR);
F16K31/60 (KR);
H02H7/0852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/43] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Motorschutzsystem | [2000/45] | English: | Electronic motor protection system | [2000/45] | French: | Système de protection électronique d'un moteur | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 06.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT, NL | 07.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5585990 (MANNING WILLIAM R [US], et al) [DA] 1,10,11 * column A * |