Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3503522B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2004 | B2 | JP2000290559 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP10177899 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1043370 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2003 | B1 | EP1043370 | 11.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP10177899 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE247696T | 15.09.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP10177899 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60004593T | 24.06.2004 | T2 | DE60004593D1 | 25.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP10177899 | 08.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6454844 | 24.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP10177899 | 08.04.1999 |