Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
01.06.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.02.2005 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.12.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
07.12.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
03.09.2004 | First examination report | |
31.08.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.08.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
22.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.03.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
21.11.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
16.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
23.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
29.09.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |