EP1046808 - Surge tank structure in intake manifold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AICHI KIKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-12, Kawanami-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 4-2-27, Hon-cho Koga-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states AICHI KIKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-12, Kawanami-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Sanoh Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 4-2-27, Hon-cho Koga-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hada, Masatoshi, c/o Aichi Kikai Kogyo K.K. 2-12, Kawanami-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Sunaga, Yasuo c/o Sanoh Kogyo K.K., 4-2-27, Hon-cho Koga-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303194.5 | 14.04.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | JP19990111513 | 19.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11151399 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046808 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046808 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046808 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/104, F02M35/10 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
F02M35/116 (EP,US);
F02M35/104 (KR);
F02M35/10039 (EP,US);
F02M35/10118 (EP,US);
F02M35/10144 (EP,US);
F02M35/10367 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | F02M35/104 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/13] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung einer Druckausgleichkammer in einem Einlasskrümmer | [2000/43] | English: | Surge tank structure in intake manifold | [2000/43] | French: | Structure de chambre d'égalisation de pression dans un collecteur d'admission | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1576402 (PORSCHE KG) [A] 1,3-5 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2719615 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE4404946 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) |