Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3380211B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2003 | B2 | JP2001299239 | 30.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU746105B | Global Dossier | 18.04.2002 | B2 | AU3014500 | 01.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1147709 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2006 | B1 | EP1147709 | 24.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2307059 | 10.08.2004 | C | CA2307059 | 28.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1323543 | 28.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI224950B | 11.12.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6187367 | 13.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000142555 | 06.04.2000 | AU3014500 | 27.04.2000 | CN00120013 | 15.05.2000 | US93629297 | 25.09.1997 | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | CA2307059 | 28.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE338472T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60030537T | 14.06.2007 | T2 | DE60030537D1 | 19.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00303242 | 17.04.2000 |