EP1056308 - System and method for using a data network as a transmission medium in a local telecommunications loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casanova, Lynn Marie 15641 Stately Oaks Drive Lockport, IL 60441 / US | 02 /
Robinson, Dana Beverley 6856 S. Shore Drive Chicago, IL 60649 / US | 03 /
Sand, Paul Raymond 11 Pheasant Court Woodridge, IL 60517 / US | 04 /
Young, Claudis L. 2680 warden Court Aurora, IL 60504 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303277.8 | 18.04.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | US19990309348 | 11.05.1999 Original published format: US 309348 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056308 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/64 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04Q3/60 (EP);
H04L2012/563 (EP);
H04L2012/5663 (EP);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP);
H04Q2213/13099 (EP);
H04Q2213/1329 (EP);
H04Q2213/13381 (EP);
H04Q2213/13383 (EP);
H04Q2213/13389 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/33] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Nutzung eines Digitalnetzes als Übertragungsmedium in der lokalen Zugriffsschleife | [2000/48] | English: | System and method for using a data network as a transmission medium in a local telecommunications loop | [2000/48] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'utilisation d'un réseau de données comme moyen de transmission dans une boucle locale d'abonnés | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5453984 (MUELLER HENRIK [DE]) [A] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 33 * * column 3, lines 12-32 *; | [Y]US5555244 (GUPTA DEV V [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 16; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 42-50 * * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 6 * * column 9, lines 27-40 *; | [A]WO9631079 (AUSTEL LICENSING GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * claims 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0829995 (SPHERE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 18 * * column 19, lines 6-10 *; | [A] - CARBALLAL D. AND AL, "ACCESS NETWORK EVOLUTION", ALCATEL TELECOMMUNICATION REVIEW, UK, (19960701), pages 166 - 175, XP000885265 [A] 1,8-10 * the whole document * |