Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
15.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
08.11.2001 | Change - extension states | |
06.07.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] |
01.06.2001 | First examination report | |
31.05.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
09.02.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
21.10.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |