Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001017072 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US32570899 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1057410 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32570899 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0000296 | 21.08.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US32570899 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2295373 | 04.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32570899 | 04.06.1999 |