EP1059142 - Carrier head to apply pressure to and retain a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Hung Chih 1530 Oyama Place San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303398.2 | 20.04.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | US19990330243 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: US 330243 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059142 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059142 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B41/06, H01L21/304 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B24B37/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/49] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Trägerplatte zum Aufbringen von Druck und zum Rückhalten eines Substrates | [2000/50] | English: | Carrier head to apply pressure to and retain a substrate | [2000/50] | French: | Tête de support pour appliquer une pression et maintenir un substrat | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07299734 ; | [A]JPH0740236 ; | [A]US5662518 (JAMES MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15* abstract *; | [A]US5720845 (LIU KEH-SHIUM [TW]) [A] 1,14,15 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US5733182 (MURAMATSU TOMOAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * column A; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07299734 A 19951114 (DOWA MINING CO LTD) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07040236 A 19950210 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * |