Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
12.02.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
12.02.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
14.01.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.10.2003 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.10.2003 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.10.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
25.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
24.01.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |
27.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
27.10.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |