Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6220944 | 24.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33024399 | 10.06.1999 | US51719900 | 02.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000354959 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33024399 | 10.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1059142 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2003 | A3 | EP1059142 | 13.12.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33024399 | 10.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6050882 | 18.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33024399 | 10.06.1999 |