EP1049028 - Efficient distribution of information to the end-user [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540-6449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540-6449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ihrie, David Wayne 21 Arnold Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303504.5 | 26.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | US19990130986P | 26.04.1999 Original published format: US 130986 P | US20000559818P | 25.04.2000 Original published format: US 559818 P | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1049028 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1049028 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H04H20/74 (EP);
G06F16/9574 (EP);
H04H20/82 (EP);
H04H60/27 (EP);
H04H60/68 (EP);
H04L67/2885 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/42] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Effiziente Endgebraucherinformationsverteilung | [2000/44] | English: | Efficient distribution of information to the end-user | [2000/44] | French: | Distribution efficace d'information à l'utilisateur final | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 01.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 11.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1165915 ; | [A]EP0836145 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 1 * * abstract *; | [XA]EP0884870 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 6-8 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 25 * [A] 9-11; | [X]CA2241634 (BROWN JEFF [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract *; | [X]WO9904345 (TIBCO SOFTWARE INC [US]) [X] 6-8 * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 8; figures 2,3 * * page 67, line 15 - page 73, line 13 *; | [X] - TEWARI R ET AL, "BEYOND HIERARCHIES: DESIGN CONSIDERATIONS FOR DISTRIBUTED CACHING ON THE INTERNET", UTCS TECHNICAL REPORT,XX,XX, (199802), pages 1 - 22, XP002130410 [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 20 - line 32 * | [X] - YU P S ET AL, "Performance study of a collaborative method for hierarchical caching in proxy servers", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, (19980401), vol. 30, no. 1-7, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 215 - 224, XP004121425 [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * page 216, column R, line 23 - page 218, column L, line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7552(98)00015-4 | [A] - "MULTI LEVEL CACHE CONSISTENCY BY SEMANTIC NETWORK SUBSCRIPTIONS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19951101), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, page 475, XP000547429 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11065915 A 19990309 (FUJITSU LTD;PFU LTD) [A] 6,9 * abstract * |