EP1048962 - Variable optical filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Inc. 570 West Hunt Club Road Nepean Ontario K2G 5W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Inc. 570 West Hunt Club Road Nepean, Ontario K2G 5W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diemeer, Mart Westerbeck van Eertenweg 21 6999CP Hummelo / NL | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | McKechnie, Neil Henry Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | McKechnie, Neil Henry Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/19] | McKechnie, Neil Kennedys, Floor 5, Queens House, 29 St. Vincent Place Glasgow G1 2DT / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303642.3 | 28.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | CA19992271159 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: CA 2271159 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1048962 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/122 (EP,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,US);
G02B6/266 (EP,US);
G02B6/2813 (EP,US);
G02B6/29358 (EP,US);
G02B6/2937 (EP,US);
G02B6/29395 (EP,US);
G02B6/3576 (EP,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G02F1/3132 (EP,US);
G02F1/3137 (EP,US);
G02B2006/121 (EP,US);
G02B26/001 (EP,US);
G02B5/28 (EP,US);
G02B6/1221 (EP,US);
G02B6/3512 (EP,US);
G02B6/355 (EP,US);
G02B6/3594 (EP,US);
G02F1/065 (EP,US);
G02F1/217 (EP,US);
G02F1/3136 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIABLER OPTISCHER FILTER | [2000/44] | English: | Variable optical filter | [2000/44] | French: | FILTRE OPTIQUE VARIABLE | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |