EP1152071 - Copper plating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electroplating Engineers of Japan Limited 6-6, Nihombashi-Kayabacho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8206 / JP | [2005/36] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Electroplating Engineers of Japan Limited 6-6, Nihombashi-Kayabacho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8206 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sone, Takayuki Nakaimachi Zohshiki 118-3, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa-ken 259-0148 / JP | 02 /
Wachi, Hiroshi 2-8 Samukawamachi Ichinomiya 5-chome Kohza-gun, Kanagawa-ken 253-0111 / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303672.0 | 02.05.2000 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152071 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152071 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/34, C25D7/12, C25D3/38, H05K3/22 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
C25D5/34 (EP);
C25D7/12 (EP,US);
C25D3/38 (EP);
H01L21/2885 (EP);
H01L21/76877 (EP);
H05K3/423 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [2002/30] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kupferplattierungsverfahren | [2001/45] | English: | Copper plating method | [2001/45] | French: | Procédé de placage de cuivre | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 17.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2903403 (WENNEMAR STRAUSS); | [E]EP1026286 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,2 * example 3 * |