EP1153804 - Electronic reversing aid with wireless transmitter and receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boddy, Terence Apt. F, 7th Floor, Tower 1, Robinson Place, 70 Robinson Road Hong Kong / CN | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2001/46] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303883.3 | 09.05.2000 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153804 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60Q9/006 (EP,US);
B60Q9/007 (EP,US);
B60K2360/173 (EP,US);
B60Q2900/30 (EP,US);
B60R21/0134 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronische Rückwärtsfahrhilfe mit drahtlosem Sender und Empfänger | [2001/46] | English: | Electronic reversing aid with wireless transmitter and receiver | [2001/46] | French: | Aide électronique à la marche arrière avec système émetteur-récepteur sans fil | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.06.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57172840 ; | [A]JPH0587565 ; | [A]JPS60244644 ; | [A]JPH10267669 ; | [A]US3760414 (NICOLSON A) [A] 1-5,14 * figure - * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 50 * * column 7, line 7 - line 55 *; | [YA]US5661651 (GESCHKE JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9,10,14 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 28 * * column 3, line 8 - line 30 * [A] 2-4,6-8,10-12,15; | [A]DE19702688 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 16 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830122), vol. 007, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 187), & JP57172840 A 19821023 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [Y] 1,2,4,9,10,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930806), vol. 017, no. 425, Database accession no. (P - 1587), & JP05087565 A 19930406 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860430), vol. 010, no. 115, Database accession no. (M - 474), & JP60244644 A 19851204 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [A] 1,2,4,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10267669 A 19981009 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |