EP1054534 - Method and apparatus for applying once-only processing in a data network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blott, Stephen Michael 384 Long Hill Road Gillette, New Jersey 07901 / US | 02 /
Yuri, Breitbart 90 Fairfax Court Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | 03 /
Martin, Clifford Eric 802 N. Vosseller Avenue Martinsville, New Jersey 08836 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/47] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00303900.5 | 09.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | US19990316118 | 20.05.1999 Original published format: US 316118 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054534 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054534 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/18 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
H04L12/1877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/32] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Anwendung von einmaliger Verarbeitung in einem Datennetzwerk | [2000/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for applying once-only processing in a data network | [2000/47] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour appliquer un traitement unique de données dans un réseau | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0913965 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,8,12-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 43 * * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 25 *; | [A]EP0445468 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,7,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 14 *; | [A]US5740346 (WICKI THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,10,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 3 * |