EP1052299 - High strength aluminum alloy for pressure casting and cast aluminum alloy comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA DAIKI ALUMINIUM KOGYOSHO 46-banchi Minamikyuhoji 3-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA DAIKI ALUMINIUM KOGYOSHO 46-banchi Minamikyuhoji 3-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Takao K. K. Daiki Aluminium Kogyosho 46-bachi, Minamikyuhoji 3-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Oshiro, Naoto K. K. Daiki Aluminium Kogyosho 46-bachi, Minamikyuhoji 3-chome Yao-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Murasima, Azumi c/o Ryobi K. K. 762 Mesaki-cho, Fuchu-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Omura, Hiroyuki c/o Ryobi K. K. 762 Mesaki-cho, Fuchu-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk, 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Cliffords Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304023.5 | 12.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | JP19990131736 | 12.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13173699 | JP19990150576 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: JP 15057699 | JP20000132662 | 01.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000132662 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052299 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C22C21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/31] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochfeste Aluminium-Legierung zum Druckgiessen und daraus gegossene Aluminium-Legierung | [2000/46] | English: | High strength aluminum alloy for pressure casting and cast aluminum alloy comprising the same | [2000/46] | French: | Alliage d'aluminium à haute résistance mécanique pour moulage sous pression et alliage d'aluminium ainsi fondu | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 16.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/32] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0796926 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-6 *; | [A] - W.HUFNAGEL, Aluminium-Taschenbuch, pages 1024-1031, DUSSELDORF, DE, ALUMINIUM VERLAG, (1986), XP002143115 |