EP1065685 - Electric switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saia-Burgess Electronics Limited Dukesway, Team Valley Trading Estate Gateshead Tyne & Wear NE11 0UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Saia-Burgess Electronics Limited Dukesway, Team Valley Trading Estate Gateshead, Tyne & Wear NE11 0UB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmes, Raymond 94 Kingsmere Chester le Street, County Durham DH3 4DE / GB | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Holt, Daniel Richard Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Holt, Daniel Richard Mewburn Ellis, York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2001/01] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304098.7 | 16.05.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | GB19990015186 | 29.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9915186 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065685 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/18, H01H21/22 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H01H13/186 (EP);
H01H21/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter | [2001/01] | English: | Electric switch | [2001/01] | French: | Interrupteur électrique | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1927511 (CHERRY ELECTRICAL PROD) [Y] 1 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE7016357U (MERIT WERK MERTEN & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2247404 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * figure 9 *; | [A]GB2064223 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4235981 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - "SWITCH ACTUATOR", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19900901), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 393 - 395, XP000106475 |