EP1056318 - Improvements relating to electrical circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW LucasVarity Electric Steering Ltd. Stratford Road Solihull West Midlands B90 4AX / GB | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states TRW LucasVarity Electric Steering Ltd. Woden Road West Wednesbury West Midlands WS10 7SY / GB | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states TRW LucasVarity Electric Steering Ltd. Woden Road West Wednesbury, West Midlands WS10 7SY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penketh, David Michael 49 Grayling Dosthill Tamworth, Staffordshire B77 1NR / GB | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304230.6 | 18.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | GB19990011905 | 22.05.1999 Original published format: GB 9911905 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1056318 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1056318 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056318 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/14, B62D5/04 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H05K1/144 (EP,US);
B62D5/0406 (EP,US);
H05K1/0215 (EP,US);
H05K1/0231 (EP,US);
H05K1/0263 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0397 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10409 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10636 (EP,US);
H05K3/202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an elektrischen Schaltungen | [2000/48] | English: | Improvements relating to electrical circuits | [2000/48] | French: | Améliorations de circuits électriques | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 18.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.05.2007 | [2009/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11225459 ; | [A]JPH10303522 ; | [A]DE3630830 (BREGENHORN BUETOW & CO [DE]); | [A]US5101322 (GHAEM SANJAR [US], et al); | [A]US5602451 (KOHGE SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5699235 (TSURUMIYA OSAMU [JP], et al); |