Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1055665
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.08.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
05.09.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
22.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.01.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
18.10.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.03.2002 |
First examination report |
|
04.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
29.06.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] |
13.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |
13.10.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |