Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3627975B | Global Dossier | 09.03.2005 | B2 | JP2000351756 | 19.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1055665 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2003 | B1 | EP1055665 | 29.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE252546T | 15.11.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0002507 | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2309439 | 05.10.2004 | C | CA2309439 | 28.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60006032T | 17.06.2004 | T2 | DE60006032D1 | 27.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1055665T | 01.03.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2206139T | 16.05.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1055665E | 31.03.2004 | E | Priority number | Date | US13654899 | 28.05.1999 |