EP1055935 - Respiratory gated multi-slab cardiac MR imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Du, Yipping Peter 332 Stevenson Lane, Apt.C5 Townson, Maryland 21046 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304387.4 | 24.05.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | US19990317510 | 24.05.1999 Original published format: US 317510 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055935 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055935 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/567 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/5676 (EP,US);
G01R33/4835 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2003/06] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Atemgetriggerte Bildgebung des Herzens in mehreren Scheiben mittels magnetischer Resonanz | [2000/48] | English: | Respiratory gated multi-slab cardiac MR imaging | [2000/48] | French: | Imagerie du coeur en tranches multiples par résonance magnétique avec déclenchement sensible à la respiration | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0793113 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 9 *; | [X] - A.BORNSTEDT ET AL., "Optimization of Coronary Artery Imaging With Real Time Navigator Correction", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, FIFTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, VANCOUVER, B.C., CANADA, APRIL 12-18,1997, vol. 2, page 914, XP002192934 [X] 1-5,7-9 * conference abstract * |