EP1087580 - Telephone system and circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manabe, Hisashi, NEC Europe Limited NEC House, 1 Victoria Road London W3 6BL / GB | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304567.1 | 30.05.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | GB19990021962 | 16.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9921962 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087580 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087580 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04M3/005 (EP);
H04L12/6418 (EP);
H04L2012/6475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/40] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fernsprechverfahren und -schaltungsanordnung | [2001/13] | English: | Telephone system and circuitry | [2001/13] | French: | Système et circuit téléphonique | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4528659 (JONES JR GARDNER D [US]) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [XA]US5692035 (O'MAHONY BARRY [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 5, line 33 - line 45; figures 1d,2a * [A] 1-9 |