EP1063240 - Improved organocopper precursor blend and method of depositing copper by chemical vapor deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Mail Stop 2634 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue, Mail Stop 2634 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Ling 784 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Ganguli, Seshadri 713 Golden Oak Drive No. 7 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
Zheng, Bo 1020 W. Riverside Way San Jose, California 95129 / US | 04 /
Wilson, Samuel 350 N. Bayview Road Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | 05 /
Marcadal, Christophe 3655 Pruneridge Avenue No.124 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304591.1 | 31.05.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | US19990339970 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: US 339970 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063240 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063240 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08, C23C16/44, C23C16/448 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C23C16/18 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4485 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | C07F7/08, C23C16/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Organokupfervorläuferzusammensetzungen, und Verfahren zur Abscheidung von Kupfer mittels CVD | [2000/52] | English: | Improved organocopper precursor blend and method of depositing copper by chemical vapor deposition | [2000/52] | French: | Mélange contenant un précurseur organocuivreux et méthode de dépôt de cuivre utilisant CVD | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 11.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5744192 (NGUYEN TUE [US], et al) [XD] 1-6 * claims 1,2 * * column 3, line 32 - line 53 *; | [X] - ZHANG, M. ET AL, "Optimization of copper CVD film properties using the precursor of Cu(hfac)(tmvs) with variations of additive content", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 132:215213, URL: STN, XP002214945 [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - NORMAN J A T ET AL, "CHEMICAL ADDITIVES FOR IMPROVED COPPER CHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION PROCESSING", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19950615), vol. 262, no. 1/2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 46 - 51, XP000517369 [X] 1,2,3-6 * page 48, column L, line 15 - line 41 * * page 51, column L, line 27 - line 37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(94)05808-3 | [A] - NORMAN J A T ET AL, "New OMCVD precursors for selective copper metallization", VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE, 1991, PROCEEDINGS., EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL IEEE SANTA CLARA, CA, USA 11-12 JUNE 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19910611), ISBN 0-87942-673-X, pages 123 - 129, XP010040520 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VMIC.1991.152975 | [ ] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL INTERCONNECT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS, SAN FRANCISCO, MAY 24-26, 1999 (1999), 170-172 PUBLISHER: INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, NEW YORK, N. Y. |