EP1059566 - Lithographic projection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Empel, Tjarko Adriaan Rudolf St. Wilfriedstraat 1 5643 SC Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Jansen, Hans Zuidewijn 33 5653 PP Eindhoven / NL | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Leeming, John Gerard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304667.9 | 01.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | EP19990201861 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99201861 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059566 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059566 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059566 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
G03F7/707 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/23] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lithographischer Projektionsapparat | [2000/50] | English: | Lithographic projection apparatus | [2000/50] | French: | Appareil de projection lithographique | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 23.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10233433 ; | [A]US5324012 (AOYAMA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 8; figures 1-8 *; | [PX]US5923408 (TAKABAYASHI YUKIO [JP]) [PX] 1,2,6,7* column 6, line 40 - line 55; figure 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10233433 A 19980902 (CANON INC) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | Examination | US5325180 | WO9924869 | EP1031877 |