Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4320922B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2009 | B2 | JP2001046084 | 20.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000165750 | 02.06.2000 | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6828129 | 07.12.2004 | B2 | US2002164727 | 07.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58546800 | 02.06.2000 | US11411602 | 07.05.2002 | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6812008 | 02.11.2004 | B2 | US2002173013 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58546800 | 02.06.2000 | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | US11411502 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1057894 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | B1 | EP1057894 | 02.01.2002 | A3 | EP1057894 | 06.12.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE466087T | 15.05.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60044276D1 | 10.06.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6537790 | 25.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP15819999 | 04.06.1999 |