EP1059679 - Storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoda, Kazuhiko Room B203, Unidia, 11-3, Umeda-Nyukaichi Kosai-shi, Shizuoka 431-0423 / JP | 02 /
Iwamura, Akira 3-4-13-505, Nakanagaocho Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8044 / JP | 03 /
Yoshihara, Yasuyuki Room 102, Copo-Kajimura, 138, Miyashitacho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 440-0044 / JP | 04 /
Hirao, Ayako 1-4-2-1005, Kanayama, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0022 / JP | 05 /
Takami, Nobuyuki R.604, Gurankoto-Shins., 5-3, Ippongi Shinsakaecho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 441-8016 / JP | 06 /
Koike, Kiichi 1460-29, Yamanishi, Ninomiyacho Naka-gun, Kanagawa 259-0124 / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00304764.4 | 06.06.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | JP19990159070 | 07.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15907099 | JP19990161909 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16190999 | JP19990161910 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: JP 16191099 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059679 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059679 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H01M50/26 (EP,US);
H01M50/147 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/22] |
Former [2000/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Speicherbatterie | [2000/50] | English: | Storage battery | [2000/50] | French: | Accumulateur | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2007 | Request for further processing for: | 12.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 11.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4347294 (MEJIA SANTIAGO) [A] 1-19* claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP0771037 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-14,17 * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 7; figures 1-4,7,8; claims 1-14 * |